+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (04/27/2017)
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary