+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Education
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor