+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended in concurrence
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- House passed as amended (floor amendment)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2019)
On June 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (01/29/2019)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2019)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance