+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2017)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services