+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On September 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2017)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance