+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2013)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013)
- Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor