+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee transferred to Senate Finance
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs