+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2015)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2015)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary