+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/29/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/07/2015)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor