+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (04/04/2013)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services