+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017)
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary