+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Health & Human Services
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021)
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services