+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary