+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance