+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2013)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary