+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/02/2013)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor