+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce