+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On September 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Senate voted to reconsider
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2017)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary