+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance