+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/28/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/17/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary