+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2013)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (06/04/2013)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance