+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2013)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2013)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education