+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's veto overridden by Senate
- House sustains the action of the Senate
- Effective Notwithstanding Governor's veto
On December 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (01/04/2022)
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- House passed Sub B
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
- Senate passed Sub B in concurrence
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021)
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
- Proposed Substitute
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2021)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary