+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services