+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services