+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/07/2013)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/06/2013)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2013)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor