+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/15/2017)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor