+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2013)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee continued
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary