+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor