+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Education
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor