+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2017)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2017)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture