+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/09/2017)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce