+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On September 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor