+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
- Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021)
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2021)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (06/03/2021)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/20/2021)
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor