+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2013)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2013)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/23/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor