+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2013)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2013)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor