+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce