+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/14/2013)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations