+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2013)
- Referred to House Judiciary
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/24/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2013)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (03/21/2013)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary