+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021)
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2021)
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance