+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Senate passed Sub B in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2015)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub B
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
On June 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary