+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2015)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2015)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/12/2015)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services