+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor