+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2015)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance