+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2016)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor