+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (06/22/2021)
- Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021)
On June 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor