+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016)
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary