+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/20/2014)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/08/2014)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor