+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2013)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2013)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services