+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/05/2016)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2016)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2016)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor